Period | Manager | Country | born |
06/05/2024 - 31/12/2024 | Walter Perazzo | 02/08/1962 | |
12/04/2024 - 05/05/2024 | Mariano Campodónico | 05/04/1974 | |
01/01/2024 - 11/04/2024 | Pablo Frontini | 03/05/1984 | |
26/06/2023 - 04/12/2023 | Alejandro Orfila | 18/05/1976 | |
27/04/2022 - 25/06/2023 | José María Bianco | 14/09/1961 | |
14/03/2022 - 26/04/2022 | Cristian Quiñónez | 01/03/1980 | |
09/02/2021 - 13/03/2022 | Fernando Ruíz | 26/04/1972 | |
25/09/2019 - 08/02/2021 | Walter Perazzo | 02/08/1962 | |
28/09/2018 - 22/09/2019 | Cristian Aldírico | 19/05/1971 | |
11/11/2017 - 24/09/2018 | Gastón Esmerado | 08/02/1978 | |
06/11/2016 - 05/11/2017 | Gustavo Álvarez | 24/11/1972 | |
01/07/2016 - 06/11/2016 | Carlos Mayor | 05/10/1965 | |
01/01/2016 - 30/06/2016 | Iván Delfino | 14/01/1971 | |
01/02/2014 - 31/12/2015 | Ricardo Rezza | 04/07/1948 | |
01/07/2006 - 19/04/2007 | Ricardo Zielinski | 14/10/1959 | |
01/01/1978 - 31/12/1979 | Jorge C. Habbeger | 19/10/1946 | |
01/01/1961 - 31/12/1961 | Juan Carlos Fonda | 05/10/1919 |