Period | Manager | Country | born |
28/02/2023 - 31/12/2024 | Jesús Ortiz | 03/09/1987 | |
13/10/2022 - 28/02/2023 | Martín Brignani | 10/05/1972 | |
01/07/2020 - 10/10/2022 | José Alí Cañas | 19/06/1960 | |
10/04/2019 - 30/06/2020 | José Parada | 22/09/1987 | |
01/01/2019 - 10/04/2019 | Jobanny Rivero | 13/12/1980 | |
07/09/2018 - 31/12/2018 | Raymond Páez | 07/11/1963 | |
03/08/2018 - 06/09/2018 | Raúl Vargas | ||
13/02/2017 - 01/08/2018 | Carlos Moreno | 19/08/1948 | |
01/07/2016 - 13/02/2017 | Horacio Matuszyczk | 29/11/1961 | |
01/01/2016 - 30/06/2016 | Renato Renauro | ||
01/10/2014 - 31/12/2015 | Lenín Bastidas | 22/09/1980 | |
01/07/2014 - 30/09/2014 | Francesco Stifano | 19/07/1979 | |
02/09/2012 - 30/06/2013 | Carlos Núñez | ||
01/01/2012 - 02/09/2012 | Jhonny Lucena | 15/07/1975 | |
01/01/1984 - 31/12/1984 | Mario González | ||
01/01/1981 - 31/12/1981 | Beltrao | ||
01/01/1979 - 31/12/1979 | José Gil | ||
01/01/1979 - 31/03/1979 | Alfredo Rojas | 20/02/1937 | |
01/01/1977 - 30/04/1977 | Dan Georgiadis | 05/05/1922 | |
01/01/1977 - 31/12/1977 | Jairzinho | 25/12/1944 | |
01/01/1975 - 30/06/1977 | Vladimir Popović | 17/03/1935 | |
01/01/1974 - 31/12/1974 | Benjamín Fernández | ||
01/01/1973 - 31/12/1973 | Walter Roque | 08/05/1937 | |
01/01/1970 - 31/12/1970 | Vladimir Popović | 17/03/1935 |