Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Pavón | 15/02/1976 | |
31/12/2022 - 30/06/2024 | Manolo Sanlúcar | 18/11/1972 | |
01/07/2022 - 30/06/2023 | Yurguen Hernández | 14/05/1988 |
Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Pavón | 15/02/1976 | |
31/12/2022 - 30/06/2024 | Manolo Sanlúcar | 18/11/1972 | |
01/07/2022 - 30/06/2023 | Yurguen Hernández | 14/05/1988 |
Country: | Spain |
Founded: | 0000 |
stadium: | ---------- |
Homepage: | ---------- |
to the profile » |