Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Evgeniy Taranukhin | 15/06/1985 | |
18/03/2023 - 30/06/2024 | Vladimir Tunkin | 19/01/1968 | |
14/10/2022 - 28/01/2023 | Georgiy Bychkov | 18/04/1992 | |
19/09/2022 - 14/10/2022 | Andrey Zakharov | 02/11/1966 | |
01/07/2022 - 19/09/2022 | Vladimir Maminov | 04/09/1974 | |
01/02/2016 - 20/06/2017 | Aleksandr Gushchin | 16/05/1966 | |
01/11/1959 - 31/12/1965 | Yuri Ilichev | 08/12/1927 |