Period | Manager | Country | born |
13/11/2023 - 30/06/2025 | Adil Shükürov | 16/08/1978 | |
12/06/2023 - 30/06/2024 | Azer Mammadov | 07/02/1976 | |
04/09/2022 - 11/06/2023 | Tarlan Ahmadov | 17/11/1971 | |
30/08/2022 - 03/09/2022 | Khalig Mardanov | 21/03/1971 | |
01/07/2019 - 29/08/2022 | Yashar Vakhabzade | 08/04/1960 | |
20/11/2017 - 30/06/2018 | Yunis Hüseynov | 01/02/1965 | |
01/07/2015 - 30/11/2017 | Shakhin Diniyev | 12/07/1966 | |
19/08/2012 - 30/06/2013 | Makhmud Gurbanov | 10/05/1973 | |
01/07/1993 - 30/06/2003 | Mehman Alahverdiyev |