Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Luis Bueno | 01/07/1986 | |
01/07/2022 - 30/06/2024 | Fernando Torres | 20/03/1984 | |
01/07/2021 - 30/06/2022 | Ricardo Ortega | ||
01/07/2018 - 30/06/2020 | Carlos González | 07/04/1986 | |
01/07/2016 - 30/06/2018 | David Galan | ||
01/07/2016 - 09/07/2018 | Manolo Cano | 26/09/1975 | |
01/07/2015 - 30/06/2017 | Carlos González | 07/04/1986 | |
01/07/2015 - 30/06/2016 | Óscar Fernández | 28/09/1974 | |
01/07/2014 - 30/06/2015 | Armando de la Morena | 17/06/1977 | |
01/07/2012 - 30/06/2014 | Roberto | 15/01/1973 | |
01/07/2011 - 30/06/2012 | Óscar Mena | 30/11/1970 | |
01/07/2008 - 30/06/2011 | Fran Alcoy | 24/06/1978 |