Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Alain Villard | 27/12/1981 | |
02/04/2024 - 30/06/2024 | Labinot Sheholli | 09/07/1988 | |
01/07/2022 - 01/04/2024 | Kurt Baumann | 28/09/1957 | |
01/01/2018 - 30/06/2021 | Albertoz Murtaj | 07/03/1982 |
Period | Manager | Country | born |
01/07/2024 - 30/06/2025 | Alain Villard | 27/12/1981 | |
02/04/2024 - 30/06/2024 | Labinot Sheholli | 09/07/1988 | |
01/07/2022 - 01/04/2024 | Kurt Baumann | 28/09/1957 | |
01/01/2018 - 30/06/2021 | Albertoz Murtaj | 07/03/1982 |
Fussball Club Besa Biel/Bienne | |
Country: | Switzerland |
Founded: | 10/12/2009 |
stadium: | ---------- |
Homepage: | https://www.fcbesa-biel.ch/ |
to the profile » |