Squad | Appearances | ||
sorting |
Goalkeeper | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leif Nielsen | BK Frem København | 28/05/1942 | ||||
Defender | ||||||
Henning Boel | 15/08/1945 | |||||
Jens Jørgen Hansen | Esbjerg fB | 04/01/1939 | ||||
Johnny Hansen | Vejle BK | 14/11/1943 | ||||
Leif Hartwig | B 1909 Odense | 09/11/1942 | ||||
Henning Munk Jensen | Aalborg BK | 12/01/1947 | ||||
Erik Sandvad | Akademisk BK | 27/01/1945 | ||||
John Worbye | Hvidovre IF | 27/01/1941 | ||||
Midfielder | ||||||
Niels Andersen | Vejle BK | 25/09/1945 | ||||
Kresten Bjerre | Akademisk BK | 22/02/1946 | ||||
Ulrik le Fevre | Vejle BK | 25/06/1946 | ||||
Niels Møller | KB København | 02/11/1939 | ||||
John Steen Olsen | Hvidovre IF | 04/01/1943 | ||||
Forward | ||||||
Keld Bak | Næstved IF | 07/06/1944 | ||||
Erik Dyreborg | 20/01/1940 | |||||
Henning Enoksen | 26/09/1935 | |||||
Finn Laudrup | Vanløse IF | 31/07/1945 | ||||
René Møller | Heart of Midlothian | 15/02/1946 | ||||
Bent Schmidt Hansen | PSV Eindhoven | 27/11/1946 | ||||
Tom Søndergaard | B.93 København | 02/01/1944 | ||||
Kjeld Thorst | Aalborg BK | 13/05/1940 | ||||
Finn Wiberg | Akademisk BK | 07/05/1943 | ||||
Manager | ||||||
Erik Hansen | since 01/01/1967 | 16/11/1922 | ||||
Poul Petersen | until 30/11/1966 | 11/04/1921 |